U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chapman et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Judgment ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Objection to PSI]
  • January 12, 2023: [Sentencing ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Ex Parte Motion to Seal PROPOSED SEALED EX PARTE event]
  • January 05, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • December 27, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • December 27, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • December 21, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • December 12, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • December 11, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 04, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 11, 2022: [Extension of Time]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 26, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 22, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 21, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 20, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 19, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 18, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 18, 2022: [Text Order]
  • April 18, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • April 18, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 18, 2022: [Detention]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 13, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 08, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 08, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 08, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.