U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hines et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 15, 2023: [Objection to PSI]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • December 27, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • December 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 05, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 28, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 18, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • November 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 14, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Proposed Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • October 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 12, 2022: [Sentencing ]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • September 13, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • September 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 13, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 07, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • August 12, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • August 12, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • August 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 12, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 08, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 08, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • July 06, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • June 24, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • June 24, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • June 24, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 03, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 09, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 09, 2022: [Remark]
  • May 09, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 27, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 27, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 21, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • April 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 21, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 20, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Text Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 20, 2022: [Detention]
  • April 20, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 19, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 08, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 08, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 08, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.