U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sosa-Canas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 21, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 10, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 09, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Text Order]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 09, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 09, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 08, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 08, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.