U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Robinson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 21, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • December 21, 2022: [Seal ]
  • December 21, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • December 09, 2022: [Statement Regarding Substantial Assistance]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 15, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • August 16, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • August 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Extension of Time]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Remark]
  • April 26, 2022: [Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • April 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice of Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • April 08, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 08, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 08, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.