U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hyman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 15, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Text Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 06, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 06, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 04, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Defendant Failed to Appear, Scheduled Hearing Not Held]
  • September 21, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order]
  • August 04, 2022: [Seal ]
  • August 04, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • July 11, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • July 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 08, 2022: [Seal ]
  • July 08, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • July 08, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • June 10, 2022: [Seal ]
  • June 10, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • May 25, 2022: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • May 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 16, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 16, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order]
  • May 11, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 11, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 11, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 08, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 08, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.