U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stephens
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 23, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • December 14, 2022: [Release Status Report]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • July 01, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 30, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 30, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • June 30, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 30, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 08, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 08, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.