U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Humphries
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Statement Regarding Substantial Assistance]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 30, 2022: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • December 30, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • December 29, 2022: [Statement Regarding Substantial Assistance]
  • December 22, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • November 21, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 17, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • August 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • August 12, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 12, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • July 29, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 19, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 18, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 18, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order]
  • April 14, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • April 14, 2022: [Detention]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 08, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 08, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.