U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03125
  • Case Name: Littlejohn v. Tabor Correctional Institution
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2025
  • January 21, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support]
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Rejection/Acceptance of Assistance from NCPLS]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice to Plaintiff Regarding North Carolina Prisoner Legal Services Inc]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • December 01, 2022: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 14, 2022: [Declaration]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Declaration]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Letter]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 10, 2022: [Declaration]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 25, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • May 25, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • May 24, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • May 20, 2022: [Letter]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • April 26, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • April 26, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 26, 2022: [Complaint]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 08, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 08, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.