U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bermudez-Martinez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • April 18, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 18, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 15, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 13, 2022: [Detention]
  • April 13, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Complaint ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.