U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thomas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • December 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • April 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 13, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Text Order]
  • April 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 11, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • April 11, 2022: [Detention]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 11, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.