U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02070
  • Case Name: Brown v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • October 06, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • June 09, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order]
  • May 05, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 11, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.