U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02069
  • Case Name: Lebron v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 03, 2022: [Case Submitted]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 25, 2022: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • April 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 12, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 11, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.