U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Velazquez-Jimenez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 15, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • June 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • June 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 20, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Text Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 13, 2022: [Detention]
  • April 13, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 11, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.