U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01355-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Medina
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Judgment ]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • May 03, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • April 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 29, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • April 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 11, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.