U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-mc-00066
  • Case Name: Designation Orders - 2022
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.