U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McLean
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 09, 2023: [Docket Call]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 06, 2023: [Withdrawal of Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 17, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 11, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • July 12, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 08, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel- Defendant]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 25, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 24, 2022: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • April 21, 2022: [USM Return Executed]
  • April 21, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 20, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Detention]
  • April 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 13, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 13, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 13, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.