U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Greene
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Plea Agreement ]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 22, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 02, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 21, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 21, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 19, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Text Order]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 14, 2022: [Detention]
  • April 14, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 13, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 13, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 13, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 13, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.