U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Robinson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 20, 2025: [Order on Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • May 12, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 10, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 09, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 09, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Finding Probable Cause]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 09, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Supervised Release]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 12, 2022: [Letter]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.