U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brewington
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • January 19, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 19, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 18, 2023: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 12, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 29, 2022: [Extension of Time]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 16, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • May 11, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • May 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Certificate of Service ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Text Order]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 03, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • May 03, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 03, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 13, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 13, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 13, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.