U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03131
  • Case Name: Ford v. Jackson et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extension of Time-Other]
  • April 22, 2025: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 17, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 16, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Compel]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
October, 2024
  • October 15, 2024: [Extension of Time-Other]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Letter]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • June 01, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • June 01, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 13, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • April 13, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • April 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.