U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03130
  • Case Name: Pike v. Grubbs
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 09, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 25, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • July 25, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 12, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 08, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 01, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 13, 2022: [Document]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 12, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • April 26, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • April 26, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • April 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 14, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 13, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • April 13, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.