U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03129
  • Case Name: Conley v. Bullard et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 07, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 30, 2022: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • September 30, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • September 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 16, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 03, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 02, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Response]
  • August 02, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Rejection/Acceptance of Assistance from NCPLS]
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice-other]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 07, 2022: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 17, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • May 17, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • May 17, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • May 13, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 13, 2022: [Complaint]
  • May 13, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • May 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 09, 2022: [Case Submitted]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order]
  • April 14, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.