U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03128
  • Case Name: Redd v. Dever et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 11, 2022: [Letter]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • April 25, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 25, 2022: [Complaint]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order]
  • April 14, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.