U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02071
  • Case Name: Walton v. Fikes
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Rule 12 Letter]
  • January 12, 2023: [Memorandum in Support]
  • January 12, 2023: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 22, 2022: [Letter to Respond Issued HC 2241]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order Directing Clerk to Continue Management of case]
  • December 12, 2022: [Response to Order]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • July 01, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 01, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • April 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 13, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.