U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Belk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • July 19, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 14, 2022: [Seal]
  • July 14, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • July 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • April 18, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • April 18, 2022: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • April 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • April 18, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 18, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 17, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • April 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 13, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • April 13, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • April 13, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.