U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03127
  • Case Name: Moore v. Danza et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order]
  • January 19, 2023: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 10, 2023: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 06, 2022: [Summons Issued]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Directing Clerk to Continue Management of case]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 27, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 25, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • May 24, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • May 24, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 27, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 13, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • April 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.