U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03132
  • Case Name: Watson v. Thomas et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [PROPOSED SEALED Document ]
  • January 24, 2023: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 24, 2023: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 19, 2023: [Request for Production of Documents]
  • January 19, 2023: [Response]
  • January 10, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 03, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice to Counsel of Failure to Make Service Within 90 Days]
  • December 16, 2022: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • December 16, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 13, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 12, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 25, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • April 14, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • April 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 13, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • April 13, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • April 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.