U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00108-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MCNEILL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • August 25, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 25, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (Not Sealed)]
  • July 22, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • July 22, 2022: [Supplement]
  • July 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (Not Sealed)]
  • July 18, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 05, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 20, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 20, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • April 20, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 18, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • April 15, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 15, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.