U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Minor
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order - Other - USCA]
  • September 01, 2022: [Case Number - USCA]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • August 27, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - USCA]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 07, 2022: [Defendant Brief]
  • June 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 06, 2022: [Defendant Brief]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 22, 2022: [Transcript]
  • May 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order]
  • April 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 26, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 21, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 15, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 15, 2022: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court - Misdemeanor]
  • April 15, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.