U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cr-00124-2
  • Case Name: USA v. BUELL et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [SEALED Document]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 07, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 01, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - Sentencing]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [SEALED Document]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • March 31, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice-Other]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Probation Petition Amended 12C/Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • January 11, 2023: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • April 15, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • April 15, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • April 15, 2022: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
  • April 15, 2022: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.