U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03135
  • Case Name: Meyers v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • December 20, 2022: [USCA Order]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 19, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 11, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Set Aside Judgment]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • July 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • June 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 01, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • June 01, 2022: [Set Aside Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 27, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • May 26, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 19, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • May 19, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 17, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 16, 2022: [Case Submitted]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order]
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 18, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 18, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.