U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00515-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Patel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 07, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 07, 2022: [Revoke]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice-other]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 05, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 21, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • June 07, 2022: [Document]
  • June 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Text Order]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • April 19, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.