U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01380-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hammock
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • October 05, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 24, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 09, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • May 09, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 27, 2022: [Text Order]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 19, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.