U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01388-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Judgment ]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 16, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • May 03, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • April 20, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.