U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Prater
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 15, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 25, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 23, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 27, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • April 28, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 28, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 20, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.