U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 06, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 02, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • May 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 31, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • May 31, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 31, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 31, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 31, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 11, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 11, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • May 11, 2022: [Arrest - Other District]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 20, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.