U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shade
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • December 12, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • December 12, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • December 06, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 06, 2022: [Factual Basis]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 21, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • November 21, 2022: [Reset Docket Call and Excludable]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 17, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 21, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Notification of Bond Violation - No Action Requested]
  • September 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 26, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 22, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 15, 2022: [Bond]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • July 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • July 14, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • July 13, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 12, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 12, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 11, 2022: [Arrest]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 20, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.