U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00100-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Toler
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 07, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • December 06, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 06, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 06, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 06, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 06, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance, Arraignment and Detention]
  • December 06, 2022: [Arrest]
  • December 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • November 14, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 20, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.