U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brintley, Jr et. al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 05, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • December 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • December 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 21, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 19, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 19, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • October 17, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • October 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 12, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • October 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 24, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 17, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 16, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 14, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 04, 2022: [Bond]
  • May 04, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • May 04, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 03, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • May 02, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 02, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 29, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 29, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 29, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 29, 2022: [Arrest]
  • April 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 28, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 27, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 27, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 27, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 26, 2022: [Arrest]
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 20, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 20, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.