U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Black
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • October 06, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Release Status Report]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 01, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 01, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 22, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • July 22, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Notice Regarding US Passport]
  • April 28, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel- Defendant]
  • April 26, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 26, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 26, 2022: [Text Order]
  • April 26, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.