U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00108-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Teague
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • December 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 07, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • December 06, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • April 27, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • April 27, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • April 27, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • April 27, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 20, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • April 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 20, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.