U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00096-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 18, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • October 07, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • September 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 19, 2022: [Service by Publication]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • September 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • September 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • July 11, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • July 11, 2022: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • July 07, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • July 07, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 02, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • July 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 01, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 17, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • May 03, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 03, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • May 02, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 29, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 28, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 28, 2022: [Arrest]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 28, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • April 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 26, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • April 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 26, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 26, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • April 25, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 21, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 21, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 21, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 21, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 21, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • April 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 20, 2022: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.