U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Valles
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 24, 2023: [Seal Document]
  • January 24, 2023: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • January 23, 2023: [Restricted Sentencing Statement]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • December 12, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 07, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice Regarding US Passport]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 23, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • August 23, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 23, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • May 13, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 10, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • May 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 04, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 03, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 02, 2022: [Text Order]
  • May 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 02, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 02, 2022: [Arrest ]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 21, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 21, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 21, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 21, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.