U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Soto
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • November 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • November 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • September 20, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • September 20, 2022: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • September 16, 2022: [Factual Basis]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 13, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • July 12, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 07, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 05, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • July 05, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • July 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 05, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • July 05, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 05, 2022: [Arrest]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 02, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • June 02, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 21, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.