U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sifontes-Montufar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 29, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • September 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 23, 2022: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • June 23, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 21, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 06, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 26, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • May 24, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 24, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • May 24, 2022: [Arrest]
  • May 24, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 21, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.