U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Del Castro
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • January 13, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 12, 2023: [Sentencing]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 14, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • November 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • September 06, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • September 06, 2022: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • September 01, 2022: [Factual Basis]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 27, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 22, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 17, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • June 17, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 17, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 17, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 17, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • June 17, 2022: [Arrest]
  • June 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 13, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 03, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • May 23, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 21, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.