U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01397-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wright
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion to Show Cause re Revocation of Probation]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Amended Motion for Revocation of Probation]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 26, 2022: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • October 25, 2022: [Amended Motion for Revocation of Probation]
  • October 25, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • October 08, 2022: [Judgment ]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 11, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • September 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • August 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 07, 2022: [Document]
  • July 07, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Defendant Failed to Appear, Scheduled Hearing Not Held]
  • April 28, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • April 28, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 22, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.