U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Devone
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • November 29, 2022: [Transcript]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 22, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 15, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 14, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 03, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 24, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 15, 2022: [Release Status Report]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 21, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 16, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • May 16, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 13, 2022: [Document]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • May 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 09, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 06, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 06, 2022: [Text Order]
  • May 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 06, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 06, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 22, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 22, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 22, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.