U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ransome
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • December 12, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • September 29, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 20, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 29, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 26, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 22, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 22, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.