U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Release Status Report]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Release Status Report]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • September 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 13, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 26, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 25, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 04, 2022: [Notice Regarding US Passport]
  • May 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 02, 2022: [Text Order]
  • May 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 02, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 02, 2022: [Arrest ]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • April 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 22, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 22, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 22, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 22, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.